OR HB3459 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Chapter 764, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Chapter 764, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increases frequency of days for which State Fish and Wildlife Commission may authorize persons to angle for fish or take shellfish without licenses or tags. Establishes Oregon Fishing Experience Enhancement Subaccount in Fish and Wildlife Account. Directs uses of moneys in subaccount.] Establishes Oregon Outdoor Activities Investment Planning Task Force. Describes duties of task force. Requires task force to report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to environment and natural resources no later than September 15, 2016.] Sunsets task force on December 31, 2016.].
Title
Relating to outdoor recreation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-28 | House | Chapter 764, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016. |
2015-07-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Olsen, Shields. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-06-26 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Helm. Passed.Ayes, 57; Nays, 2--Buehler, Witt; Excused, 1--Weidner. |
2015-06-26 | House | Second reading. |
2015-06-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2015-06-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-17 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-11 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2015-04-27 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2015-04-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-04-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-04-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-04-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-09 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2015-03-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |