OR HB3454 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 684, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 8, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 684, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 8, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Describes actions school districts are required to take or are prohibited from taking regarding students who are unable to pay for meals. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.
Title
Relating to school meals; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike McLane [R] | Rep. Brian Clem [D] | Rep. John Huffman [R] | Sen. David Smith [R] |
Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-06 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Chapter 684, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 8, 2017. |
2017-08-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Boone. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2017-07-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-06-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by McLane. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Bentz, Boone. |
2017-06-13 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 14, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 13, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-08 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-06-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-05-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-05-11 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2017-05-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |