OR HB3454 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-02 - Chapter 685, (2011 Laws): Effective date September 29, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-02 - Chapter 685, (2011 Laws): Effective date September 29, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to net operating losses; and prescribing an effective date.
Title
Relating to net operating losses; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-02 | Chapter 685, (2011 Laws): Effective date September 29, 2011. | |
2011-08-02 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-23 | President signed. | |
2011-06-23 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-16 | Third reading. Carried by Telfer. Passed. Ayes, 28; nays, 1--Boquist; excused, 1--Burdick. | |
2011-06-15 | Carried over to 06-16 by unanimous consent. | |
2011-06-14 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-14 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-06-10 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Finance and Revenue. | |
2011-06-07 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-06-06 | Third reading. Carried by Brewer. Passed. Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Schaufler; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Tomei. | |
2011-06-02 | Second reading. | |
2011-05-31 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2011-05-23 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-04-01 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. | |
2011-03-22 | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. | |
2011-03-18 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development with subsequent referral to Revenue. | |
2011-02-21 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |