OR HB3441 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-17)
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Chapter 664, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 25, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-17)
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Chapter 664, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 25, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Oregon Hatchery Research Center Board.
Title
Relating to the hatchery research center near Alsea; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-25 | House | Chapter 664, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 25, 2013. |
2013-07-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-01 | House | Rules suspended. House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Bailey, Weidner. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 29; nays, 1--Boquist. |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng. bill. (Printed C-Eng.) |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. and be referred to Rules. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-04-18 | House | Third reading. Carried by Krieger,Witt. Passed. Ayes, 58; Absent, 1--Keny-Guyer; Excused, 1--Gomberg. |
2013-04-17 | House | Second reading. |
2013-04-16 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2013-04-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2013-04-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-03-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-03-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |