OR HB3440 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 683, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 683, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Removes special training requirement from statutes governing prescribing, dispensing and distributing naloxone. Specifies that reimbursing cost of medication prescribed for purpose of treating opioid or opiate withdrawal does not require prior authorization during first 30 days of treatment. Specifies that individual may not be denied entry into specialty court in this state solely for reason that individual is taking, or intends to take, medication prescribed by licensed health care practitioner for treatment of drug abuse or dependency. Requires Oregon Health Authority to publish and report information related to opioids and opiates. Requires pharmacy to report deidentified information to prescription monitoring program upon dispensing prescribed naloxone. Requires pharmacy to report certain other identifying information to prescription monitoring program upon dispensing prescribed controlled substance classified in schedules II through IV. Requires information to be disclosed from prescription monitoring program to medical director or pharmacy director. Requires information to be disclosed from prescription monitoring program for certain other purposes. Requires licensing information of licensees who are authorized to prescribe or dispense controlled substances to be provided to authority for purpose of qualifying licensees to report information to, or receive information from, prescription monitoring program. Specifies that authority may require person requesting deidentified information from prescription monitoring program to enter into data use agreement with authority. Requires authority, not less than once per year, to develop, through use of prescription monitoring information, criteria by which practitioner may be required to receive education or training on prescribing of opioids or opiates. Creates Prescription Monitoring Program Prescribing Practices Review Subcommittee for purposes of advising authority on development of criteria, reviewing practitioner's history to determine whether practitioner meets criteria and directing authority to provide educational material to practitioner who meets criteria. Provides that authority may enter into agreements governing sharing and use of information reported to prescription monitoring program with regulatory authorities of other states that administer prescription monitoring programs. Provides that prescription monitoring program provisions become operative January 1, 2018. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to drugs; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Rules, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Rules, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Chapter 683, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017. |
2017-08-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Linthicum. |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-07-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 1--Boone; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Barker, Smith DB. |
2017-07-01 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2017-06-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-06-29 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-06-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-06-26 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2017-05-23 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-05-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-05-18 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-05-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-20 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker and then Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-20 | House | Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Rules, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-04-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |