OR HB3434 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 681, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 681, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extends sunset date for public safety fiscal emergency program for counties. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to public safety fiscal emergencies; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Chapter 681, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017. |
2017-08-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-06-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Lininger. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Boone, Meek. |
2017-06-01 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-31 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-05-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2017-04-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |