OR HB3427 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter 122, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Fund for Student Success. Directs Department of Education to conduct study to examine best methods for funding state's system of kindergarten through grade 12 public education.] Directs department to submit report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2020.] Specifies uses of fund, including transfers to State School Fund, Student Investment Account, Statewide Education Initiatives Account and Early Learning Account. Directs moneys to be transferred to State School Fund from Fund for Student Success. Increases fiscal year limit for transfers from State School Fund to High Cost Disabilities Account. Establishes Student Investment Account for purpose of distributing grants to school districts and certain public charter schools. Prescribes allowed uses for grant moneys, grant application requirements, inclusion of performance growth targets into grant agreements, calculation of grant amounts and accountability measures. Directs Department of Education to provide technical assistance related to grants, including coaching programs for grant recipients that did not meet performance growth targets and intensive program for high needs school districts. Directs department to make annual report to committees of Legislative Assembly related to education. Establishes Statewide Education Initiatives Account. Prescribes allowed uses of account. Provides for expansion of school breakfast and lunch programs, operation of youth reengagement system, establishment of Statewide School Safety and Prevention System, development and provision of statewide equity initiatives, provision of summer learning program for certain schools and funding for early warning system for high school graduation and directs Department of Education to fund those programs through account. Directs department and Educator Advancement Council to develop plan funded by account that would provide effective combination of programs and initiatives for professional development of educators. Establishes Early Learning Account. Prescribes allowed uses of account. Establishes Early Childhood Equity Fund. Provides for early childhood support grant program, to be funded by account. Decreases personal income tax rates. Imposes corporate activity tax, to be measured by commercial activity, defined as total amount arising from person's transactions and activity in regular course of business. Exempts persons with taxable commercial activity of $1 million or less. Defines additional excluded persons exempt from corporate activity tax. Allows subtraction for percentage of taxpayer's cost inputs or labor costs. Includes provision for sourcing of commercial activity to state. Requires persons and unitary groups with commercial activity above threshold to register with Department of Revenue. Preempts local government imposition of taxes upon commercial activity or receipts from grocery sales, other than existing taxes. Transfers net revenues from corporate activity tax to Fund for Student Success. Defines terms. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2020. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to education funding; prescribing an effective date; and providing for revenue raising that requires approval by a three-fifths majority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Withdraw from Committee (Y: 10 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Motion to Refer (Y: 20 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24HouseChapter 122, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
2019-05-16HouseGovernor signed.
2019-05-15SenateMotion to withdraw from the Governor failed. Ayes, 10; Nays, 17--Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Fagan, Frederick, Golden, Hass, Johnson, Manning Jr, Monnes Anderson, President Courtney, Prozanski, Riley, Roblan, Steiner Hayward, Taylor, Wagner; Excused, 3--Gelser, Olsen, Winters.
2019-05-15SenatePresident signed.
2019-05-15HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-05-13SenateThird reading. Carried by Roblan, Hass. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 11--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Knopp, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Winters.
2019-05-06SenateSecond reading.
2019-05-06SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2019-05-02SenateReferred to Student Success.
2019-05-02SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-05-01HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Evans, Leif.
2019-05-01HousePassed. Ayes, 37; Nays, 21--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 2--Barker, Sprenger.
2019-05-01HouseMotion to refer to Revenue failed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 38--Alonso Leon, Bynum, Clem, Doherty, Evans, Fahey, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Hernandez, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, Lively, Marsh, McKeown, McLain, Meek, Mitchell, Nathanson, Neron, Nosse, Piluso, Power, Prusak, Rayfield, Reardon, Salinas, Sanchez, Schouten, Smith G, Smith Warner, Sollman, Speaker Kotek, Wilde, Williams, Williamson, Witt; Excused, 2--Barker, Sprenger.
2019-05-01HouseThird reading. Carried by Smith Warner, Nathanson.
2019-04-30HouseSecond reading.
2019-04-29HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2019-04-29HouseWork Session held.
2019-04-25HouseWork Session held.
2019-04-23HouseInformational Meeting held.
2019-04-18HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-04-16HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-04-10HouseReferred to Student Success.
2019-04-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB3427
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3427/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3427/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3427/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3427/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/29186
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=463123
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=463166
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=465878
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=466709

Bill Comments

feedback