OR HB3417 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-02 - Chapter 684, (2011 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-02 - Chapter 684, (2011 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to finances of public charter schools; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to finances of public charter schools; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Hunt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-02 | Chapter 684, (2011 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2011. | |
2011-08-02 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-28 | President signed. | |
2011-06-28 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-21 | Vote explanation(s) filed by Kruse. | |
2011-06-21 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist. | |
2011-06-21 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-21 | Recommendation: Without recommendation, returning to President. Referred to third reading. | |
2011-06-21 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2011-06-21 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-06-21 | Third reading. Carried by Hunt. Passed. Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Hicks; Excused, 1--Gelser. | |
2011-06-20 | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 21, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-06-20 | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on June 20, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-06-20 | Rules suspended. Second reading. | |
2011-06-20 | Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2011-06-17 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-17 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2011-06-17 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-16 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. | |
2011-06-16 | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the Co-Speaker. | |
2011-06-16 | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Ways and Means. | |
2011-06-10 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-20 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-04-12 | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. | |
2011-04-12 | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. | |
2011-04-06 | Work Session held. | |
2011-03-16 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to Education. | |
2011-02-21 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |