OR HB3411 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Oregon Department of Emergency Management to develop report on 9-1-1 emergency reporting system. Directs Oregon Department of Emergency Management to develop report on 9-1-1 emergency reporting system. Sets forth topics and other requirements for report. Specifies stakeholders with whom department must collaborate. Requires department to submit report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to emergency management no later than September 30, 2024. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to emergency communications; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-03-03HouseReferred to Emergency Management, General Government, and Veterans.
2023-02-28HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback