OR HB3408 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 680, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 680, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifies that person may register to vote or update voter registration by having other person deliver voter registration card to designated agency or official. If delivered voter registration card has missing or incomplete information, requires county clerk to use all sources available to obtain missing or incomplete information. If information is still missing or incomplete, requires county clerk to use reasonable efforts to contact person to obtain information by telephone, mail and electronic mail.
Title
Relating to voter registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Chapter 680, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-08-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed.Ayes, 24; nays, 6--Baertschiger Jr, Girod, Kruse, Linthicum, Olsen, Thomsen. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-06-19 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB. |
2017-06-19 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed.Ayes, 42; Nays, 14--Barreto, Esquivel, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark; Excused, 3--Bentz, Boone, Whisnant; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2017-06-15 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-06-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-24 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2017-03-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |