OR HB3407 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-26 - Chapter 752, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-26 - Chapter 752, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Traditional Health Workers Commission within Oregon Health Authority to advise authority on adoption of criteria and descriptions for coordinated care organizations to use with respect to certain health workers who are not licensed by this state and training and education requirements for those workers.
Title
Relating to the Traditional Health Workers Commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Gallegos [D] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] | Rep. Brian Clem [D] | Rep. John Lively [D] |
Rep. Jim Thompson [R] | Rep. Jim Weidner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-26 | House | Chapter 752, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014. |
2013-08-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 27; nays, 3--Ferrioli, George, Olsen. |
2013-07-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-07-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-07-06 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gallegos. Passed. Ayes, 52; Nays, 7--Bentz, Berger, Esquivel, Huffman, Krieger, Sprenger, Whitsett; Excused, 1--Weidner. |
2013-07-06 | House | Second reading. |
2013-07-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-07-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-07-03 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-07-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-07-03 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2013-06-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-06-13 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |