OR HB3394 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter 148, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter 148, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies required child care resource and referral entity services. Repeals requirement that] Requires resource and referral entity to match specified amount of public funds received by entity] funds as required by Early Learning Council by rule. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to child care providers; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | House | Chapter 148, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-05-22 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-16 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Heard. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Carried over to 05-15 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Human Services. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-17 | House | Third reading. Carried by Lively. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2019-04-16 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 17, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-04-15 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2019-03-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |