OR HB3389 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Passed on July 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-19 - Chapter 625, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Passed on July 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-19 - Chapter 625, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits beneficiary from requiring as condition of short sale, except in certain circumstances, that nonprofit entity that purchases property in short sale, or that purchases note from beneficiary, enter into agreement with beneficiary or grantor that limits or bars grantor from owning or occupying residential property after short sale or sale of note.
Title
Relating to foreclosures of residential trust deeds; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-19 | House | Chapter 625, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2013. |
2013-07-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-02 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Thomsen. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2013-06-20 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-06-19 | House | Third reading. Carried by Conger. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2013-06-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 19, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-17 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2013-06-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-22 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2013-04-22 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2013-04-18 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Efficiency. |
2013-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |