OR HB3388 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies annual salaries of judges of Supreme Court, Court of Appeals, circuit courts and Oregon Tax Court. Provides that, beginning on July 1, 2021, annual salaries of judges may not be less than specified percentage of annual salary of judge of United States District Court. Eliminates provision connecting salaries of members of Legislative Assembly and circuit court judges. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to compensation of elected officials; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-03-28 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-03-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |