OR HB3378 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to fund engineering and design work necessary for adding bicycle and pedestrian lane to Bridge of the Gods. Appropriates moneys to fund engineering and design work necessary for adding add] bicycle and pedestrian lane to Bridge of the Gods. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to the Bridge of the Gods; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-09 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred to Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-03-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |