OR HB3377 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Chapter 604, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Chapter 604, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Joint Committee on Conduct as joint committee of Legislative Assembly. Establishes Legislative Equity Office as independent nonpartisan office of Legislative Assembly and directs Legislative Assembly to, by concurrent resolution, appoint Legislative Equity Officer to serve as executive officer of Legislative Equity Office. Directs Joint Committee on Conduct to establish standards and criteria for individuals unaffiliated with legislative branch to perform services as independent investigator, and directs Legislative Equity Officer to select independent investigator, to conduct investigations of conduct asserted to violate standards of harassment, discrimination or retaliation prescribed by legislative branch personnel rules. Requires Legislative Equity Officer to conduct at least two hours of respectful workplace training each calendar quarter. Specifies topics of training. Requires legislators and legislative staff, interns and volunteers to attend training annually. Requires registered lobbyists to attend annual training, beginning in 2021. Directs lobbyists to certify training attendance to Oregon Government Ethics Commission and directs commission to report lobbyist training attendance to officer. Directs Legislative Equity Officer to regularly conduct culture and climate surveys of legislators, legislative staff, lobbyists and others who regularly interact with legislative branch. Requires Legislative Equity Officer to receive information from any individual about harassing behavior and to provide confidential process counseling to individuals who believe they have experienced or observed harassment. Requires Legislative Equity Officer to establish and maintain Capitol Leadership Team to serve as mentors and resources for promoting more respectful workplace or to assist those facing challenges in workplace. Directs Joint Committee on Conduct to establish minimum qualifications and criteria for offsite process counselors and directs Legislative Equity Officer to contract with offsite process counselors to receive information from individuals concerning harassing behavior and to provide confidential process counseling to individuals who believe they have experienced or observed harassment. Establishes evidentiary privilege and exemption from public records disclosure for confidential communications and records created or maintained by offsite process counselor concerning harassment in State Capitol. Establishes public records exemption for records of independent investigator conducting harassment investigations, and for records of Legislative Equity Officer that relate to disclosures, reports or allegations made to officer. Limits scope and duration of exemption of independent investigator records. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the legislative branch; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-01 | House | Chapter 604, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 23, 2019. |
2019-07-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Burdick. Passed. Ayes, 27; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-06-13 | House | Third reading as Special Order of Business. Carried by Williamson. Passed. Ayes, 58; Nays, 2--Nearman, Reschke. |
2019-06-13 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on June 13, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-06-12 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2019-06-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-30 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-05-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-21 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2019-05-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-05-01 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-17 | House | Public Hearing and Possible Work Session cancelled. |
2019-04-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Capitol Culture. |
2019-03-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |