OR HB3370 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 219, (2017 Laws): Effective date June 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 219, (2017 Laws): Effective date June 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Defines "housing with services project" and requires project to register with Department of Human Services . Defines "housing with services project" and requires project to register with Department of Human Services provides exceptions to registration requirement. Directs Department of Human Services to provide information to housing with services projects and collaborate with Housing and Community Services Department and federal Department of Housing and Urban Development to collect certain data. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to housing with services projects; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 219, (2017 Laws): Effective date June 6, 2017. |
2017-06-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Olsen, Steiner Hayward, Thatcher. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Human Services. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-05-04 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sanchez. Passed.Ayes, 60. |
2017-05-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 4, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 3, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 2, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 1, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-26 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2017-03-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |