OR HB3350 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prescribes requirements for providing education to student with disability during COVID-19 emergency. Prescribes requirements for providing education to student with disability during COVID-19 emergency. Directs Department of Education to convene advisory group for purpose of assisting students with disability to meet their individual educational needs during COVID-19 emergency. Directs department to establish process to provide compensatory or recovery educational services and for parents to resolve related claims. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to education services provided to students with a disability; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-27 | House | Informational Meeting held. |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to Education. |
2021-03-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3350 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3350/Introduced |