OR HB3350 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Department of Education to prepare statement that discloses potential health risks of wireless technology. Requires public and private schools to distribute statement to employees and parents of students. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2015.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to health risk disclosures in school; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-06HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2015-03-06HouseReferred to Health Care.
2015-02-27HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback