OR HB3349 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Disallows, for purposes of personal income taxation, mortgage interest deduction for residence other than taxpayer's principal residence, unless taxpayer sells residence or actively markets residence for sale. Disallows, for purposes of personal income taxation, mortgage interest deduction for residence other than taxpayer's principal residence, unless taxpayer sells residence or actively markets residence for sale. Phases out allowable deduction for interest for principal residence based upon income. Disallows deduction for principal residence above threshold amount. Establishes Oregon Housing Opportunity Account. Transfers amount equal to estimated increase in revenue attributable to restrictions on deduction of mortgage interest to accounts in Oregon Housing Fund] account. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2019. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to tax treatment of mortgage interest; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2019-04-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2019-03-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2019-03-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |