OR HB3345 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred to Human Services.
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Department of Human Services to conduct study of staffing ratios of direct care staff to residents and factors that contribute to cost of care in long term residential facilities. Requires Department of Human Services to conduct study of staffing ratios of direct care staff to residents and factors that contribute to cost of care in long term residential facilities. Requires department to report to interim committees related to health care, by September 15, 2022, department's findings from study and recommendations for legislative changes needed to limit increases in costs of care without discouraging improvements in services, staffing ratios or staff wages. Sunsets January 2, 2023. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to long term residential care; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09HouseReferred to Human Services.
2021-03-02HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback