OR HB3320 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-24 - Chapter 263, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-24 - Chapter 263, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes new requirements on hospitals with respect to financial assistance policies and processes. Imposes new requirements on hospitals with respect to financial assistance policies and processes. Requires Oregon Health Authority to impose civil penalties for violation of requirements.].
Title
Relating to financial assistance for the cost of health care services.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Reynolds [D] | Sen. Deb Patterson [D] | Rep. Ben Bowman [D] | Rep. Julianne Fahey [D] |
Rep. Travis Nelson [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-24 | House | Chapter 263, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024. |
2023-07-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-06-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Findley. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 4--Bonham, Girod, Smith DB, Weber; Absent, 6--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Carried over to 06-22 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Carried over to 06-21 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Carried over to 06-20 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2023-04-18 | House | Third reading. Carried by Reynolds. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 4--Cate, Elmer, Morgan, Reschke; Excused, 2--Osborne, Wallan. |
2023-04-14 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 17, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-04-13 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 14, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-04-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 11, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-04-10 | House | Second reading. |
2023-04-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2023-04-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-03-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health and Health Care. |
2023-02-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |