OR HB3317 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-7)
Status: Passed on August 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-26 - Chapter 749, (2013 Laws): Effective date October 7, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-7)
Status: Passed on August 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-26 - Chapter 749, (2013 Laws): Effective date October 7, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Extends period of applicability of emergency communications tax.
Title
Relating to emergency communications taxes; prescribing an effective date; and providing for revenue raising that requires approval by a three-fifths majority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-26 | House | Chapter 749, (2013 Laws): Effective date October 7, 2013. |
2013-08-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Starr. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-07-08 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Read. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Boone; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Olson. |
2013-07-08 | House | Second reading. |
2013-07-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2013-07-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-07-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-05-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-18 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2013-04-05 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2013-04-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-04-04 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-04-03 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-03-27 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2013-03-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2013-03-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-03-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to Veterans' Services and Emergency Preparedness with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2013-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |