OR HB3313 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes Oregon Advocacy Commissions Office, Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Commission on Black Affairs, Commission for Women and Commission on Asian and Pacific Islander Affairs to employ paid interns and staff necessary to supervise interns. Requires] Authorizes Oregon Advocacy Commissions Office, Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Commission on Black Affairs, Commission for Women and Commission on Asian and Pacific Islander Affairs to each employ at least one paid intern] employ paid interns and staff necessary to supervise interns. Appropriates moneys for purpose of employing interns. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to advocacy commissions; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-04-04HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2023-04-04HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2023-03-30HouseWork Session held.
2023-03-14HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-02-23HouseReferred to Rules.
2023-02-21HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/HB3313
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3313/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3313/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3313/A-Engrossed
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23738
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77019
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/74405
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77055
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77377
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/264954
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/264281
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268600
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268596
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77803
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34955

Bill Comments

feedback