OR HB3313 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates certain land in Clackamas County as acknowledged urban reserve. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to land reserve boundaries in Clackamas County; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-12 - House - House Withdraw from Committee (Y: 25 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-06-12 | House | Motion to withdraw from Rural Communities, Land Use, and Water failed.Ayes, 25; Nays, 32--Barker, Barnhart, Barton, Boone, Buckley, Clem, Doherty, Fagan, Frederick, Gallegos, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Holvey, Hoyle, Keny-Guyer, Komp, Lininger, Lively, McKeown, Nathanson, Nosse, Rayfield, Read, Reardon, Smith Warner, Taylor, Vega Pederson, Williamson, Witt, Speaker Kotek; Excused, 3--Barreto, Esquivel, Johnson. |
2015-03-06 | House | Referred to Rural Communities, Land Use, and Water. |
2015-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |