OR HB3307 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Environmental Quality Commission to adopt by rule program for regulating air contaminant emissions from new facilities generating methane or other toxic gas. Requires Department of Environmental Quality to administer and enforce program. Becomes operative January 1, 2019. Requires department to report on program to interim committees on environment and natural resources no later than September 15, 2020.
Title
Relating to air contaminant emissions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2017-03-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB3307 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3307/Introduced |