OR HB3300 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Corrections to create, in collaboration with Oregon Criminal Justice Commission, pilot program establishing Center for Incarcerated Parents and Their Children at Coffee Creek Correctional Facility. Directs Department of Corrections to conduct study on provision of treatment services to persons in custody of department and present report on findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to judiciary on or before September 15, 2020.] Sunsets January 2, 2021.] Provides that center shall be administered by YWCA of Greater Portland. Specifies goals of center and services that must be provided. Requires department to perform analysis of center and report results of analysis to Legislative Assembly beginning September 15, 2021, and every two years thereafter. Appropriates moneys to Oregon Criminal Justice Commission for distribution to YWCA of Greater Portland for purposes of program. Sunsets program on January 1, 2025. Directs department to designate employee of Coffee Creek Correctional Facility as gender-responsive officer. Specifies duties of officer. Directs officer to conduct assessment of facility and report to Legislative Assembly during 2021 regular session with summary of assessment and policy recommendations. Directs officer to develop 10-year strategic plan for facility. Directs officer to report on status of strategic plan to Legislative Assembly each regular session beginning in 2023. Directs officer to create Gender-Responsive Advisory Council.
Title
Relating to the Department of Corrections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-19 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-04-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-03-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |