OR HB3291 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Department of Administrative Services, in coordination with Legislative Fiscal Officer and Legislative Revenue Officer, to prepare biennial budget stress test report that estimates effects on state finances of hypothetical negative economic conditions. Directs department to submit report to Legislative Assembly in last calendar quarter of each even-numbered year.
Title
Relating to budget stress testing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-07-06 | House | Motion to withdraw from Ways and Means failed.Ayes, 26; Nays, 33--Alonso Leon, Barker, Barnhart, Clem, Doherty, Evans, Fahey, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Hernandez, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, Lininger, Lively, Malstrom, Marsh, McKeown, McLain, Meek, Nathanson, Nosse, Piluso, Power, Rayfield, Reardon, Sanchez, Smith Warner, Sollman, Williamson, Witt, Speaker Kotek; Excused, 1--Boone. |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to Revenue with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-03-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |