OR HB3291 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows school district and post-secondary institutions of education to apply for funding to form K-20 partnership. Sunsets funding authority June 30, 2017. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2015.
Title
Relating to educational partnerships; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-04-20 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2015-04-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-04-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-04-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-06 | House | Referred to Education. |
2015-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |