OR HB3283 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases maximum allowable balance of Criminal Justice Revolving Account.
Title
Relating to the Criminal Justice Revolving Account; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-18 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2013-04-03 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-03-27 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-02-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |