OR HB3272 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Permits Secretary of State to collect and share and communicate with approved organizations information about ethnicity, gender, veteran status and street address or electronic mail address of owner or principal of business that applies for or renews registration in this state. Permits Secretary of State to collect and share and communicate with approved organizations information about ethnicity, domicile and] gender, veteran status and street address or electronic mail address of owner or principal of large] business that applies for or renews license, permit or] registration in this state. Requires local agencies and state agencies to collect and report information about ethnicity, domicile and veteran status of owner or principal of large business.] Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to information collected in conjunction with business registrations in this state; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-10 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2023-04-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2023-04-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-03-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-03-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-03-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Economic Development and Small Business. |
2023-02-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |