OR HB3263 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Governor signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Governor signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State of Oregon to grant paid leave to eligible employees who are victims of domestic violence, harassment, sexual assault or stalking.
Title
Relating to leave from employment for state employees who are victims of certain crimes; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-02 | House | Chapter 613, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 2, 2013. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 28; nays, 1--Girod; excused, 1--Close. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-06-20 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-06-19 | House | Third reading. Carried by Parrish. Passed. Ayes, 49; Nays, 8--Cameron, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Krieger, Sprenger, Whitsett; Excused, 2--Fagan, Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2013-06-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 19, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-17 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-06-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-10 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-05-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-05-07 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2013-04-23 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to Business and Labor with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-02-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |