OR HB3260 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-02 - Chapter 678, (2011 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-02 - Chapter 678, (2011 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to support services for youth; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to support services for youth; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-02 | Chapter 678, (2011 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2011. | |
2011-08-02 | Governor signed. | |
2011-07-19 | President signed. | |
2011-07-05 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-29 | Third reading. Carried by Bates. Passed. Ayes, 30. | |
2011-06-28 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-28 | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. | |
2011-06-27 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2011-06-27 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-06-27 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Freeman. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 3--Conger, Tomei, Whisnant; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Roblan. | |
2011-06-27 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-24 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. | |
2011-06-24 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-22 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2011-06-22 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-10 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-06-08 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. | |
2011-04-20 | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. | |
2011-04-20 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. | |
2011-04-18 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-13 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-06 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-02-21 | Referred to Human Services. | |
2011-02-14 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |