OR HB3253 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Environmental Quality to conduct study and develop recommendations for legislation to encourage transition to cleaner burning woodstoves or other cleaner home heating options. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to energy source conversion programs; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-03-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2015-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HB3253 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3253/Introduced |