OR HB3243 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-13 - Chapter 651, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 6, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-13 - Chapter 651, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 6, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permits funeral establishment to take custody of unclaimed body of indigent person. Abolishes Demonstrator of Anatomy. Directs State Mortuary and Cemetery Board to reimburse funeral establishment for costs related to disposal of unclaimed body of indigent person. Directs board to maintain list of institutions that may accept or process bodies for educational purposes. Requires educational institution that uses unclaimed body of deceased person to pay costs related to use of unclaimed body. Directs board to collect fee upon report of death. Specifies use of fee. Directs board to adopt rules. Increases limitation on expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by board. Decreases limitation on expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts and other moneys, but excluding lottery funds and certain federal funds, collected or received by Oregon Health Authority. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to deceased persons; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng bill. (Printed C-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Printed B-Eng) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng bill. (Printed C-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Printed B-Eng) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-13 | House | Chapter 651, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 6, 2015. |
2015-07-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-25 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 58; Absent, 1--Nathanson; Excused, 1--Weidner. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Bates. Passed.Ayes, 28; absent, 1--Beyer; excused, 1--Olsen. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng. bill. (Printed C-Eng.) |
2015-06-19 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Human Services and Early Childhood, then Ways and Means. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-04-30 | House | Third reading. Carried by Weidner. Passed.Ayes, 53; Excused, 2--Boone, Nathanson; Excused for Business of the House, 5--Clem, Gilliam, Helm, Post, Witt. |
2015-04-29 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 30, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-04-28 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 29, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-04-27 | House | Second reading. |
2015-04-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2015-04-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2015-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |