OR HB3242 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Chapter 431, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Chapter 431, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires peace officer to electronically record custodial interview with person under 18 years of age when investigating felony, or allegation that person under 18 years of age committed act that if committed by adult would constitute felony. Requires peace officer to electronically record custodial interview with person under 18 years of age when investigating felony. Requires jury instruction on, or court consideration of, superior reliability of recorded statements if state offers testimony concerning unrecorded statement as evidence in certain proceedings. Requires law enforcement agency to store copy of interview for specified length of time. Requires district attorney to provide copy of recording of interview as discovery.
Title
Relating to law enforcement interviews of persons under 18 years of age.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-13 | House | Chapter 431, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-22 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 53; Excused, 7--Bentz, Boone, Helm, McLane, Noble, Smith G, Witt. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed.Ayes, 27; nays, 1--Girod; excused, 2--Boquist, Gelser. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-05-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Heard. |
2017-05-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 2, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 1, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 27, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 26, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-24 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-03-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |