OR HB3242 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-24 - Chapter 430, (2015 Laws): Effective date June 16, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-24 - Chapter 430, (2015 Laws): Effective date June 16, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Permits State Mortuary and Cemetery Board to grant temporary operating permit for cemetery without operating license to perform interment. Permits State Mortuary and Cemetery Board to assume control of insolvent, bankrupt or disowned cemetery to carry out existing prearrangement sales contracts to which cemetery is party and to effect rights of plot owners] grant temporary operating permit for cemetery without operating license to perform interment. Directs board to adopt rules. Sunsets January 1, 2018. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to cemeteries; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-24 | House | Chapter 430, (2015 Laws): Effective date June 16, 2015. |
2015-06-16 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Boquist, Olsen. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-04-23 | House | Third reading. Carried by Weidner. Passed.Ayes, 51; Excused, 7--Gorsek, Heard, Kennemer, Rayfield, Reardon, Stark, Whitsett; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Buckley, Fagan. |
2015-04-22 | House | Second reading. |
2015-04-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2015-04-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2015-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |