OR HB3229 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 303, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 303, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to convene advisory council to assist with recommendations related to health care standards in local correctional facilities. Directs Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to convene advisory council to assist with recommendations related to health care standards in local correctional facilities. Requires commission to submit report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to judiciary on or before September 15, 2022. Sunsets January 2, 2023. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to health care for adults in custody in local correctional facilities; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 303, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-06-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 5--Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Boquist, Kennemer, Taylor. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Marsh. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Evans, Nearman. |
2021-04-27 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-23 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2021-04-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2021-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-26 | House | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-02-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |