OR HB3216 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to conduct study on persons released from local correctional facilities due to circumstances caused by COVID-19 and to provide results of study to interim committees of Legislative Assembly no later than May 31, 2022. Directs Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to conduct study on persons released from local correctional facilities due to circumstances caused by COVID-19 and to provide results of study to interim committees of Legislative Assembly no later than May 31, 2022. Sunsets January 2, 2023. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to release from incarceration; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Kropf [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-26 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-02-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3216 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3216/Introduced |