OR HB3216 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Chapter 415, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Chapter 415, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates civil cause of action against person who knowingly summons police officer with intent to cause specified harm. Creates civil cause of action against person who knowingly summons police officer for reason other than suspected criminal activity] with intent to cause specified harm.
Title
Relating to unlawfully summoning a police officer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | House | Chapter 415, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Findley, Greenlick, Marsh; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Smith G. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Olsen; Excused, 1--Taylor. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Carried over to 06-03 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-23 | House | Third reading. Carried by Bynum. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Marsh; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Nathanson. |
2019-04-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 23, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-04-18 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-04-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-02-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |