OR HB3213 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Department of Administrative Services and Attorney General to study issues relating to state procurement and report to appropriate committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly on or before September 15, 2022. Directs Oregon Department of Administrative Services and Attorney General to study issues relating to state procurement and report to appropriate committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly on or before September 15, 2022. Sunsets January 2, 2023.
Title
Relating to state procurement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-26 | House | Referred to General Government. |
2021-02-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3213 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3213/Introduced |