OR HB3213 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 501, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 501, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Transportation to establish county safety corridor program. Authorizes counties to establish safety corridors and directs counties to post signs in selected safety corridors.] Establishes County Safety Corridor Advisory Group. Imposes reporting obligations on counties in pilot program. Sunsets January 2, 2026.
Title
Relating to safety corridors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Chapter 501, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 29. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-06-04 | House | Third reading. Carried by Boshart Davis, Post. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Hernandez, Speaker Kotek. |
2019-06-03 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-05-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2019-02-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |