OR HB3208 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
Pending: Joint Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Department of Human Services to study and develop two-year and five-year plans for department to provide comprehensive funding for child welfare services, ensure adequate in-state services for children's therapeutic care and request sufficient funding for high level staff. Requires department to submit draft plans by September 15, 2019, and final plans by September 15, 2020, to interim committee of Legislative Assembly. Directs department to study state law relating to investigations of abuse of children in care and make recommendations for legislation necessary to permit department to adopt, by rule, certain child in care abuse investigation framework. Directs department, beginning January 1, 2020, to provide investigation assistance to child abuse investigators. Directs department to report annually to Legislative Assembly on implementation of investigation assistance and recommendations to further minimize trauma to child victims and child abuse investigators. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to child welfare; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2019-04-15HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2019-04-08HouseWork Session held.
2019-03-20HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Human Services and Housing.
2019-02-28HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback