OR HB3199 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - Chapter 223, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - Chapter 223, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits release of sky lantern, discharge of exploding target or discharge of tracer ammunition during fire season on or near forest protection district lands.
Title
Relating to the use of incendiary devices in proximity to forested areas.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike McLane [R] | Rep. Caddy McKeown [D] | Rep. Sal Esquivel [R] | Rep. David Gomberg [D] |
Rep. Bradley Witt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-23 | House | Chapter 223, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014. |
2013-05-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-05-17 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Boquist declared potential conflict of interest. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 26; nays, 3--Boquist, Whitsett, President Courtney; excused, 1--Johnson. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-04-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 1--Hicks; Absent, 1--Smith; Excused, 2--McKeown, Vega Pederson. |
2013-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-04-08 | House | Second reading. |
2013-04-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2013-04-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-03-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2013-02-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |