OR HB3197 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes State Fish and Wildlife Commission Nominating Committee to assist Governor in appointing members to State Fish and Wildlife Commission.
Title
Relating to state fish and wildlife commission appointments.
Sponsors
Rep. Sal Esquivel [R] | Rep. Wayne Krieger [R] | Rep. Mike Nearman [R] | Sen. Herman Baertschiger [R] |
Sen. Chuck Thomsen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-03-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2015-02-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HB3197 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3197/Introduced |