OR HB3177 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 276, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 276, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows seizure, constructive possession and forfeiture of hens and chicks used in connection with cockfighting operation. Amends existing offense of forcible recovery of fighting bird, punishable by maximum of five years' imprisonment, $125,000 fine, or both, to include forcible recovery of seized hens and chicks. Revises offense elements to conform language to related statutes.
Title
Relating to cockfighting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 276, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed.Ayes, 26; excused, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Olsen, Steiner Hayward, Thatcher. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-05-04 | House | Third reading. Carried by Olson. Passed.Ayes, 60. |
2017-05-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 4, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 3, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 2, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 1, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-26 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-04-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-03-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |