OR HB3172 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Revenue to suspend collection of unpaid tax from elderly taxpayer, if certain conditions exist. Provides for annual review of taxpayer's eligibility for suspension. Applies to tax debt that is outstanding as of January 1, 2016. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to collection of tax from elderly taxpayers; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Cliff Bentz [R] | Rep. John Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-04-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2015-02-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HB3172 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3172/Introduced |