OR HB3168 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 214, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 214, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes operation of boats propelled by electric motors on named lakes and waters of this state under certain circumstances. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to boats; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Chapter 214, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-06-04 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 3--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Linthicum; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Carried over to 05-23 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Carried over to 05-22 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-11 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Barreto, Noble, Sprenger, Stark. |
2019-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 11, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-04-09 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Natural Resources. |
2019-02-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |