OR HB3166 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 738, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 738, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes teacher authorization pilot program for purpose of determining effectiveness of alternative requirements for teachers of noncore courses. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to teacher licensing; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Cliff Bentz [R] | Rep. Sherrie Sprenger [R] | Rep. Sal Esquivel [R] | Rep. Wayne Krieger [R] |
Rep. Gene Whisnant [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-22 | House | Chapter 738, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015. |
2015-07-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 28; nays, 1--Ferrioli; excused, 1--Olsen. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-06-26 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Sprenger. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Weidner. |
2015-06-26 | House | Second reading. |
2015-06-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2015-06-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-19 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-06-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-06-03 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2015-05-26 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2015-04-24 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2015-04-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-04-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-04-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to Education. |
2015-02-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |