OR HB3163 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-7)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
Pending: Joint Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Department of Veterans' Affairs, in its biennial agency request budget, to request certain level of funding. Requires Governor's budget to fund department at certain level of funding. Requires Legislative Assembly to fund department at certain level of funding. Provides that requirements do not apply under certain negative economic conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to services for veterans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2019-04-09HouseRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2019-04-02HouseWork Session held.
2019-03-19HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2019-02-28HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback